Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shelly A. Seymour presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelly A. Seymour Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Warrant Return
Date: October 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Warrant Return Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Warrant Return
Judge: Dougherty, Frank |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.