Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Brian L. McCabe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian L. McCabe Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time104 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt of Transfer | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Entry of Default | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default/Uncontesed/Judgment | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.