Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Child |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Confidential Historical Documents | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Legal Separation | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Summons | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.