Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2012 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions127 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time127 days |
Notice: Entry of Judgment
Date: March 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Support Payment | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default/Uncontesed/Judgment | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment-DCSS | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Entry of Default | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint: Supplemental | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.