Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shelly A. Seymour presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2012 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions184 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time184 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Department Child Support Services Support Calculations | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default/Uncontesed/Judgment | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.