Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shelly A. Seymour presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2012 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Declaration | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Court Hearing
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for DVPA no Children (Existing Case) | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
* Public * Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.