Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Casey Aitchison presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2012 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Request | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Aitchison, Casey |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.