Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Casey Aitchison presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey Aitchison Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time53 days |
Motion
Date: November 16, 2018Review: Contempt
Date: October 17, 2017Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: June 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Aitchison, Casey |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Motion Judge: Aitchison, Casey |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Department Child Support Services Support Calculations | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation Pro Tempore Judge | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.