Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Confidential Historical Documents | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice/Acknowledgment | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.