Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Donald E. Shaver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald E. Shaver Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2009 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Date: August 29, 2017Review: Seek Work
Date: December 01, 2017Ex-Parte Application
Date: May 03, 2017Warrant Return
Date: May 30, 2017Ex-Parte Application
Date: March 06, 2018Review: Seek Work
Date: February 23, 2018Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Date: April 03, 2018Review: Seek Work
Date: July 03, 2018Application and Order
Date: July 10, 2018Review: Contempt
Date: March 26, 2019Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: October 16, 2018Warrant Return
Date: August 28, 2018Review: Contempt
Date: December 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Foster, David |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Foster, David |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.