Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maria Carmen Butler, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Arturo Aguero, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Gregory Olson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law Custody And Support Of Minor Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Declaration Regarding Notice of Request for Emergency Orders (RI-FL004)
Date: December 21, 2021Applcation and Order for Posting
Date: February 18, 2022Child Custody Recommending Counseling Questionnaire
Date: February 08, 2022Findings and Orders on Request for Emergency Order
Date: December 21, 2021Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders (FL-305)
Date: December 21, 2021Ex Parte Request for Order
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Family Law Case Management Order (Parentage)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Petition for Custody and Support of Minor Children. (FL-260)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.