Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Antonia Robinson, Department Of Child Support Services, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Donnel Robinson, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy F. Freer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law Dissolution With Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-309)
Date: August 08, 2023Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306)
Date: August 02, 2023Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing
Date: August 04, 2023Proof of Service re: Request for Order
Date: July 27, 2023Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration (FL-141)
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Declaration of Disclosure
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-309)
Date: 2023-05-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306)
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counseling Questionnaire
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Memorandum 4/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Electronic Service - Request to Reschedule Hearing
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Certificate of Completion of On-Line Course UP TO PARENTS.
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Continued Hearing
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Order to Attend Child Custody Recommending Counseling Appointment
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Notice of Continued Hearing
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Review of Surrender of Firearms as to Donnel Robinson
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Court Hearing (DV-109) on Domestic Violence With Child(ren) filed by ANTONIA ROBINSON
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Status Conference - Video
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Status Conference - Remote Appearance by Video
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Notice Regarding Payment of Support - Substitution of Payee
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Information Notice of Judgment
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Order After Hearing on 07/08/2021 on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by ANTONIA ROBINSON
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice Regarding Payment of Support (FL-632)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Substitute of Attprney
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00(Signed) Order After Hearing
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00orah
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Notice of Motion (DCSS) re: Health Care, Modification filed on 03/18/2021
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice Regarding Payment of Support (FL-632)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Motion (DCSS) re: Health Care, Modification filed on 03/18/2021
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service re: NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Order Pursuant to Referral to Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Formal Report on Guideline Support (XSpouse)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counseling Questionnaire
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by ANTONIA ROBINSON
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Recommended Order Pursuant to Referral to Child Custody Recommending Counseling held on 12/9/2020
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Memorandum 12/10/2020
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration of Donnel Robinson in Response to Petitioner's Request for Order
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Notice of Request for Emergency Orders (RI-FL004)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration re: Antonia Robinson re: Spousal Support
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing via Remote Telephonic Appearance
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Completion of On-Line Course Donnel DeSean Robinson
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00XP RFO on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by ANTONIA ROBINSON
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Supplemental Declaration of Antonia Robinson re: Spousal Support
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Response to Petition for Dissolution, Legal Separation, or Nullity. (FL-120)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Electronic Service - Responsive Declaration to Request for Order
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Findings and Orders on Request for Emergency Order
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Response-Marriage/Domestic Partnership
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Request for Order With All Attachments
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Confidential Contact Information (RI-FL011)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Exhibit List on Domestic Violence With Child(ren) filed by ANTONIA ROBINSON
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Request for order
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Exhibit List 01
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order (DV-100)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Confidential CLETS Information (CLETS-001)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.