Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jennifer Ali Duarte, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Noe Bolivar Duarte, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy F. Freer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law Dissolution With Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service re: Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 05, 2022Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing via Remote Telephonic Appearance
Date: June 12, 2020Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Status Notice Checklist
Date: June 22, 2022Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Response to Petition for Dissolution, Legal Separation, or Nullity. (FL-120)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2022Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Family Law Case Management Order
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order to Attend Child Custody Recommending Counseling Appointment
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.