Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Manzano Cardenas, Anna L., filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Manzano, Martin J., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2023 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed Online | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed Online | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Referral To Family Court Services - Mediation | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.