Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Toon, Stephanie, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Loscutoff, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.