Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ramirez, Jaymi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, Samantha M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: McBride-Pera, Kim E |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | FL - Request to Continue Hearing | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | FL - Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: McBride-Pera, Kim E |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report-Recommendation | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.