Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Henry Camacho, Damaris Bricela, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Burn, Selwyn, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.