Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jackson, Lucious Edward, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shakir, Zenzele Mudiwa, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Response - Dissolution | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Property Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.