Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Solorio, Steve John, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Venegas Cervantes, Maria De Los Angeles, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Property Declaration | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.