Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tyo, Brittany Nadine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tyo, Paul Wesley, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.