Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Webb, Deanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Webb, Daryl, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Matter Set for 3 Year Review for Dismissal | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation to Appear | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.