Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eisenberg , Lisa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Eisenberg , Robb, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.