Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rios, Leticia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rios, Richard, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.