Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Franks, Deborah, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Franks, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2023 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DV - Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Record Check Received Sheriff | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.