Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Apel, Linee, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gonzalez, Lorenzo Orlando, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2023 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Record Check Received Sheriff | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Record Check to Sheriff's | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Yuba County Sheriff Jurisdiction | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.