Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Ferris, Makaylan, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mckinley, Jake, represented by Steffenson, Kimberly Anne, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2023 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief Filed | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DV - Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Record Check Received Sheriff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.