Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
January 22, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
January 21, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
January 20, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
January 19, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
January 18, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
January 17, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/17/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: COM. JANET L. FRANKEL REPORTER: CLERK: TRACY CORTEZ PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCE... | |
March 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCEEDIN...
Judge: Shannon M Gerhart |
|
March 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCEEDIN...
Judge: Shannon M Gerhart |
|
March 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300355 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A, ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSE PAUL PETRAKIS and RESPONDENT: HANNAH SEMENOVA NATURE OF PROCEEDIN...
Judge: Shannon M Gerhart |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.