Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
Last RefreshedJune 06, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
June 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
June 02, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 29, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/30/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/16/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 21, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/16/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... | |
May 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/16/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2300064 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: AMBER MENDENHALL and RESPONDENT: MAXWELL MENDENHALL NATURE OF PR... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.