Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: ___CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCE... | |
March 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: ___CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCE... | |
March 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCEEDI... | |
March 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: ___CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCE... | |
March 24, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCEEDI... | |
March 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: ___CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCE... | |
March 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/22/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: FL2300001 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: ___CLERK: STACY BOND PETITIONER: JESSICA WILSON and RESPONDENT: MICHAEL TRAVIS WILSON NATURE OF PROCE... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.