Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2024 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2024 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/08/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/08/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 07, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/01/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/01/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 05, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/01/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 04, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/01/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 02, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/01/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... | |
February 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 02/01/24 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2203237 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: MICHELA MARIE MASSOLETTI and RESPONDENT: MASON REX MASSOLETT... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.