Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... | |
February 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... | |
February 04, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... | |
February 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... | |
February 02, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... | |
February 01, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... | |
January 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/31/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: K CASE NO: FL2201435 PRESIDING: HON. SHEILA S. LICHTBLAU REPORTER: CLERK: JENN CHARIFA PETITIONER: JOHN ALLAN LYLE and RESPONDENT: AZUMA SASAKI LYLE NATURE OF PROC... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.