Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sanchez Perez, Veronica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cervantes Sanchez, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2024 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion Court notes that the Respondent is currently in custody. |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service JONATHAN CERVANTES SANCHEZ WAS PERSONALLY SERVED WITH BLANK RESPONSE, NOTICE OF HEARING AND RELATED DOCS ON 03/06/2024 |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE BERONIO THROUGH URGENT TASK |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE BERONIO - DEPT 3 |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.