Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Calder, Heather, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ruiz, Rodolfo, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2024 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - DV/TRO POS OR POSTING ORDER Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DV-116 SENT TO DEPT 3 URGENT TASKS |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO status on Proof of Service Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion - No proof of service filed. Petitioner to work with the Family Law Facilitator to prepare posting order and/or perfect service. |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance JAIME GARFIELD WITH EMPOWER YOLO |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion No appearance by or for either party. After court, the clerk contacted petitioner via telephone. Petitioner stated she mis-calendared the date and requested a new hearing date. Court's file notes next scheduled date is April 9th,2024. Petitioner referred to the Family Law Facilitator re service on Respondent's whereabouts which are unknown. |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.