Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Martinez, Antonio, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Garicia Ortiz, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Review
Date: March 26, 2024*Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: January 30, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review C C R C Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Dismissal - Other Dismissal - Before Hearing By mutual agreement, parties withdraw [PETR] the request for DVRO. |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted The 18 yr old adult son may bring the children to Father's home on Friday at 7pm with the children being returned to Mother on Sunday at 8pm. |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | *Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED MARIA /GUADALUPE GARCIA ORTIZ ON 1/17/24 WITH BLANK RESPONSE, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDER(DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)(DV-140), CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND SUPPORT REQUEST (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)(DV-105), NOTICE OF HEARING(DV), REQUEST FOR ORDER, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Denied Restraining Order 1ST AMENDED- DENIED TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.