Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Krystek, Kaitlin Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Krystek, Garrett Austin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: February 01, 2024*Review
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Review psychological eval/visits Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Review C C R C / DVRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Orientation Filed Proof of Orientation Submitted by Petitioner |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) 1ST AMENDED |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling with Jeannie Murk |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | *Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.