Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Singh Shankar, Romeeta, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Uplenchwar, Ravindra, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Brown, Danette C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrown, Danette C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2024 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause 3 hours Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Registration of Out-of-State Custody Order | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice OF REGISTRATION OF OUT OF STATE CUSTODY SUPPORT ORDER |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney ROBERT C STRAMBI IN PLACE OF KEITH BANKS FOR THE RESP |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION- ALEXANDER COLLINS, JR. FILED BY PET |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice FILED BY ATTNY FOR RESP RAVINDRA UPLECHWAR Notice of Limited Scope Representation- ATTNY KEITH BANKS FOR THE RESP |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Confirmed Reg of Out of State Child Custody Ord | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.