Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kaiser, Russell, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Chairez, Kelli, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Brown, Danette C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrown, Danette C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2024 |
CategoryElder Abuse |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Order to Show Cause TRO Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Restraining Order After Hearing DVRO Granted |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order After Hearing EXPIRES 2/13/2029 AT MIDNIGHT |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration RE: VIOLATION OF RESTRAINGING ORDER; FILED BY RUSSELL CHARLES KAISER |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE BROWN FOR REVIEW OF REQUEST AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents DV-115 REQUEST TO CONTINUE HRG DUE TO DV-116 MISSING AND NOT INLCUDED WITH FILING. |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV RESPONDENT'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED KELLI CHAIREZ WITH ATTACHMENTS, NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE PROTECTION) EA-109, REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE EA-100, RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE EA-110, TRO (EA-100) BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 1/9/2024 |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.