Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Gehringer, Vanessa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gehringer, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Review
Date: March 06, 2024*Review
Date: December 14, 2023*Motion
Date: January 30, 2024*Request for Order: Initial
Date: September 14, 2023*Request for Order: Modification
Date: March 26, 2024*Request for Order: Initial
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference /Trial Setting Conference Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Review - update on D3 issues and briefing schedule Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification CHILD/SPOUSAL SUPPORT Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Support CHILD/SPOUSAL SUPPORT |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance All appearing parties |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration FILED BY ATTNY FOR PET VANESSA GEHRINGER Responsive Declaration |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED DEREK HOOPER WITH PETITIONERS RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ELECTRONICALLY ON 3/21/2024 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED RON LADAGE WITH PETS RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ELECTRONICALLY ON 3/21/2024 |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Change of Address FILED BY ATTY FOR PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.