Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yolo County Family Support Division, against Ruiz, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Taylor, Katherine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: May 09, 2023*Motion
Date: July 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review Seek Work Order Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance All appearing parties |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM OAH; 10/3/23 |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF OAH VIA TASKS & QUEUE |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received SHORT FORM OAH |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Glanzer; Jorge Ruiz |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM OAH; 7/18/23 HRG |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF SHORT FORM OAH VIA TASKS & QUEUE |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received SHORT FORM OAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.