Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Tevini, Nicholas James, I, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Hernandez, Daisy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: November 15, 2023*Review
Date: May 04, 2023*Request for Order: Initial
Date: March 15, 2023Further Court Trial
Date: August 03, 2023Further Court Trial
Date: August 04, 2023*Trial: Long Cause
Date: August 02, 2023*Trial: Long Cause
Date: August 01, 2023*Ex Parte
Date: March 28, 2024*Ex Parte
Date: July 19, 2022*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: July 10, 2023*Ex Parte filed
Date: March 28, 2024*Ex Parte
Date: July 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte [RESP] Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | *Ex Parte filed | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQ FOR EX PARTE; FILED BY PRO PER RESP |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application RESPONDENTS REQUEST; EX PARTE RE: SANCTIONS |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents EX PARTE ORDER 03.28.24 |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EXHIBITS AND EX PARTE ORDER TO DEPT 3 |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF DAISY HERNANDEZ |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received RESPONDENTS EXHIBITS |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte [RESP] Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Notice of Ex Parte FILED BY DAISY HERNANDEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.