Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kemp, Paul, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Rodriguez, Ignacio, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryElder Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: June 24, 2021*Trial: Short Cause
Date: August 02, 2021*Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 20, 2021*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: July 26, 2021*Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 08, 2021*Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To SENT TO WEST SAC PD VIA CCPOR. CERTIFIED COPIES PLACED IN PRO PER BIN UNDER "K" |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Short Cause OSC for RO, 2 days Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.