Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Loeser, Micheal Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Loeser, Amanda Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with SONIA CORTES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSONIA CORTES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Review CCRC Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Orientation Filed Proof of Orientation Submitted by Petitioner |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Orientation Filed Proof of Orientation Submitted by Respondent |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned CHARLES JENSEN |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Ex Parte Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED MICHAEL ANTHONY LOESER IN PERSON WITH NOTICE OF MOTION AND DECL FOR JOINDER; SUMMONS (JOINDER); BLANK RESPONSIVE DECL ON 12/21/23 |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial EX PARTE; CHILD CUSTODY & VISITATION; FILED BY PET |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling with Jeannie Murk |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQ FOR EX PARTE ORDER; FILED BY PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.