Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Yolo Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Juarez, Miracle Cantu, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Umanzio, Dennis A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Motion MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Atty Glanzer |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Motion MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue: Child Support | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED MIRACLE CANTU JUAREZ WITH FILED JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS 2/24/21 ON 3/1/21 BY MAIL |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | *Judgment - judgment/order - Before Hearing | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations (Governmental) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Dec. for Default or Uncontested Judgment | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default AGAINST MIRACLE CANTU JUAREZ |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.