Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Segura, Margarita Castaneda, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Segura, Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted Relieve counsel - atty Cohen relieved as counsel |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED FRANCISCO SEGURA W/ DECLARATION AND 26 ATTACHMENT ON 10/07/2020 |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY MARGARITA CASTANEDA SEGURA |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LETTER FROM MS. COHEN SENT TO JUDGE CORTES FOR REVIEW |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Received FROM SUSAN G COHEN |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Copy of Minute Order to counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.