Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rahimi, Aryan, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rahimi, Storay, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | *Dismissal: Lack of Prosecution | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Denied FOR TEMP DVTRO DENIED |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) SERVED STORAY RAHIMI WITH TRO, NTC OF HRG, REQUEST FOR DVRO, BLANK ANSWER ON 8/31/20 |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Denied Restraining Order | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | *Domestic Violence Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.