Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Yeranossian, Desiree A., filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Yeranossian, Artin Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause Custody, CCRC, 10 days Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.