Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2023 |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... | |
March 07, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... | |
March 06, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... | |
March 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... | |
March 04, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... | |
March 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... | |
March 02, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/02/23 TIME: 9:00 A.M. DEPT: L CASE NO: FL2000881 PRESIDING: HON. MARK A. TALAMANTES REPORTER: CLERK: JORDENNE FERENCZI PETITIONER: JAKELINE CAROLINA MEJIA BARRIOS and RESPONDENT: EDVIN ORLAND... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.