Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Plumas County. This case was filed in Plumas County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2018 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlumas County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. The Court will discuss the results of mediation.
Judge: Douglas Prouty |
|
October 22, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. This matter was continued for receipt ofthe signed Mediation Agreement.
Judge: Douglas Prouty |
|
September 10, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. The Court has not received the executed Mediation Agreement.
Judge: Douglas Prouty |
|
August 13, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. The Judgment, which contained the 2016 Mediation Agreement was finally filed last month. Each party is ordered to file a declaration regarding what problems have...
Judge: Douglas Prouty |
|
July 09, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. The Court will discuss the results of mediation.
Judge: Douglas Prouty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.