Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Clare Keithley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2013 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time2318 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Annual Review; Continued from 1/2/2020 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Order Terminating Guardianship |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing of Orders Terminating Guardianship | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Guardianship-Supervision Terminated Order Terminating Guardianship of Loretta Peterson Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Guardianship of Jonathan Peterson
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Petition to Terminate Guardianship Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Complete and Return Status Report | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Termination Report & Recommendation |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Report and Recommendation re Termination |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.