Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Magness, Weldon C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Greig, Julie, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial329 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions435 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Mtn to Set Aside Marital Property Judgment filed 12/3/15 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Court Trial Minute Order Date: 6/14/2016 |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in opposition to the equitable relief requested |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of equitable relief |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Mtn to Set Aide Marital Property Judgment filed 12/3/15 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Limited Scope Representation by Atty-Carolyn Chan |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Hearing (Probate/Mental Health) [R] NOM TO SET ASIDE MARITAL JUDGMENT FLD 12/03/15 CONT FROM 2/23/16 @ REQ OF [P] TO OBTAIN COUNSEL Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [R] NOM TO SET ASIDE MARITAL JGMT Desc2: FLD 12/03/15 Desc3: *REISSUED FROM 1/5/16* Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.